Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/15/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/12/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/29/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/21/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/10/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/16/2010