Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/18/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/18/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/29/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2010