Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/25/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2010