Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/26/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/02/2010