Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/01/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/07/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 12/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/21/2010