Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/29/2010