Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/13/2010