Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 11/17/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/17/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 11/17/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/17/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/18/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/18/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/18/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/18/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 12/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/16/2010