Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 11/06/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/15/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/15/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/12/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/25/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/23/2010