Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2009