Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/05/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/06/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 11/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/17/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/17/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/17/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/17/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/17/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/18/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/18/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/01/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 12/08/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/08/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/10/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/10/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/11/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/11/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/11/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/15/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/15/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/12/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/12/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/19/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 01/19/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/19/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/26/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/02/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/17/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/06/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2010