Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/26/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/03/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/04/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/04/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/04/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/04/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/04/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/05/2010