Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/29/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/07/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/06/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/26/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/21/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/22/2010