Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/08/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/08/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/08/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/15/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/15/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/09/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/30/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/10/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/29/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/29/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/29/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/16/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/16/2010