Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 12/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/07/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/07/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/07/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/08/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/08/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/09/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/10/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/12/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/12/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/29/2010