Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/14/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/14/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/14/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/27/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 11/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/14/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/24/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/24/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/24/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/25/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/03/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/03/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/03/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/03/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/03/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/11/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/01/2010