Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/01/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/06/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/07/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/07/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/07/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010