Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/07/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/14/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/15/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/27/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/14/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew