Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/20/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/16/2009