Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 10/07/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/15/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/21/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/26/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/26/2009