Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/23/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/23/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/17/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/17/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/21/2010