Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/06/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/06/2009