Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.3145 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  • S.Amdt.2942 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prevent Medicare from being raided for new entitlements and to use Medicare savings to save Medicare.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/06/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Proposed amendment SA 2942, under the order of 12/7/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12599)
  • S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)