Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/24/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/12/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/27/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/29/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/23/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/24/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/01/2010