Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/16/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/16/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/16/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/16/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/20/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/18/2009