Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/29/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/29/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/01/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/09/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/02/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/26/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/14/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/18/2010