Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/12/2010