Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/08/2010