Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/18/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/02/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/11/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/23/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/23/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/08/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/14/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/14/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/19/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/21/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/30/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/17/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/18/2010