Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/14/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/13/2010