Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 07/29/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/14/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/07/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 10/07/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/13/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/20/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/22/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/18/2010