Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/14/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/14/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/15/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/25/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/02/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/02/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/02/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/09/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/09/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/25/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/25/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/08/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2010