Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/06/2010