Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/24/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/24/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/15/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/30/2010