Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/15/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/20/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/20/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/28/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/08/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/09/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/09/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/09/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/10/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/10/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/20/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/02/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew