Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/13/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/24/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/24/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/24/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/24/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/24/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/02/2009