Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/29/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/29/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/17/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/12/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/27/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2010