Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/17/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/17/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/17/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/27/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/27/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/27/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/27/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/27/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/27/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/31/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/31/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/08/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/10/2010