Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010