Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/29/2010