Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/14/2009