Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/25/2010