Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/30/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/13/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/29/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/29/2010