Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/14/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/02/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/16/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/28/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/2010