Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/14/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/25/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/19/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/03/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/11/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/16/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/23/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/15/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/22/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/05/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/20/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/20/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/20/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/29/2010