Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/24/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/13/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/15/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/17/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/30/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/06/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/21/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/11/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/12/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/28/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew