Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/13/2010