Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/18/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/18/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/18/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/18/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/24/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/24/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/08/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/09/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/16/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/21/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/24/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/30/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/22/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/27/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/21/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/21/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/15/2010