Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/24/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/08/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/09/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/21/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/21/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/24/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/24/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/28/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/29/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/29/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/29/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/30/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/08/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/10/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/10/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/15/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/21/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/21/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/21/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/25/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/01/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/04/2009