Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/12/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 06/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/12/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/08/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/24/2010